MD HB32 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a petition for emergency evaluation to be in the form of an electronic record and transmitted and received electronically.
Title
Mental Health Law – Petitions for Emergency Evaluation – Electronic Record
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {283227/1 Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-01-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2021-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Subjects
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Examinations
Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Petitions
Public Health
Records
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Examinations
Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Petitions
Public Health
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 624 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |