MD HB32 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a specified property tax credit against the property tax imposed on specified property located in specified communities in Baltimore City; establishing the amount and duration of the property tax credit; providing for the eligibility requirements of the property tax credit; providing the Act shall be applicable to all taxable years beginning on or after June 30, 2016; etc.
Title
Restoring and Sustaining Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-08-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Baltimore City
Corporations
Home Improvement
Leases and Rent
Property Tax
Public Officials
Real Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Urban Renewal
Baltimore City
Corporations
Home Improvement
Leases and Rent
Property Tax
Public Officials
Real Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Urban Renewal