MD HB319 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering to under 16 years of age rather than 18 years, the age range for which a certain charge relating to truancy is applicable; reducing the maximum terms of imprisonment from 10 to 3 days for a first conviction and 30 to 5 days for subsequent convictions under the Act; authorizing the imposition of community service on conviction of certain charges related to truancy; and altering the application of a certain affirmative defense relating to a certain truancy charge.
Title
Juvenile Law – Truancy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 706 |
2018-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Recede |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment {738072/1 Withdrawn |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Motion Recede (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Delegates J. Lewis, Atterbeary, and Corderman |
2018-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2018-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {738072/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {842310/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts
Education
Juvenile Law
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Truancy
Youth
Education
Juvenile Law
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Truancy
Youth