MD HB316 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, except under specified circumstances, a pharmacist to dispense drugs that contain substances listed in Schedule II, Schedule III, Schedule IV, or Schedule V in lockable vials; authorizing the State Board of Pharmacy to adopt specified regulations; requiring the Board to create and make available to pharmacists a statement that educates patients on the potential for abuse and diversion of drugs that contain specified controlled dangerous substances; etc.
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Abuse
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Education
Health Occupations
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Education
Health Occupations
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Storage