MD HB316 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person who is detained for specified alcohol- or drug- related driving offenses from knowingly refusing to take a specified blood or breath test if the person was detained previously for specified alcohol- or drug-related driving offenses and refused to take a blood or breath test; and providing that a violation is punishable by a fine of not more than $1,000 or imprisonment for not more than 1 year or both.
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Refusal to Take a Blood or Breath Test -
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. William Bronrott [D] | Del. Steven DeBoy [D] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] |
Del. William Frank [R] | Del. Ronald George [R] | Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0316.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0316f.pdf |