MD HB312 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 629
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 629
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to issue not more than 10 hotel or motel licenses, hotel or restaurant licenses, entertainment center licenses, or hotel lobby licenses to the same license holder.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licenses Allowed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 629 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Frederick County
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Frederick County
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants