MD HB311 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Court Dog and Child Witness Program to provide a facility dog or therapy dog to a child witness in any circuit court proceeding or other related court process, meeting, or interview; providing participation in the Program by a circuit court is voluntary; requiring participating courts to adhere to the procedures adopted by the Administrative Office of the Courts; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to develop a plan to implement the Program and ensure the details are publicly available; etc.
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 161 |
2020-03-17 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment {213427/2 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {412219/1 Adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB101 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 162
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Attorneys
Child Custody
Circuit Courts
Counties
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Dogs
Examinations
Judges
Minors
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Victims
Witnesses
Attorneys
Child Custody
Circuit Courts
Counties
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Dogs
Examinations
Judges
Minors
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Victims
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 9 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |