MD HB310 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB287

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-04 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program to provide grants for the expansion of, the renovation of, or major repairs to a facility operated by a certain eligible organization; requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2023 through 2028, to include $3,000,000 for the Program in the State budget; requiring the establishment of a competitive application process and a quantitative system to evaluate each application; prohibiting an organization from receiving a grant for a single project that exceeds $1,000,000 in any fiscal year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-04HouseHearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2020-09-08HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB323 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
SB287 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback