MD HB310 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies; to identify and study all State efforts to combat driving while under the influence of drugs and alcohol to include a review of national best practices and new technologies; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; terminating the Act after June 30, 2021; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies
Sponsors
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D] | Del. Wanika Fisher [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] |
Del. Susan McComas [R] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Electronic Surveillance
Minors
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Repeate Offenders
Reports
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Electronic Surveillance
Minors
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Repeate Offenders
Reports
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving