MD HB310 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting owners, employees, and operators of tanning facilities from allowing minors to use tanning devices.
Title
Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2014-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |