MD HB31 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available for certain vehicles a special registration plate supporting hunger relief initiatives; authorizing certain persons to apply to the Administration for the special registration plate for certain classes of vehicles; requiring the owner of a vehicle assigned a special registration plate to pay certain fees; establishing the Hunger Relief Initiatives Fund; requiring that certain fees collected under the Act be used only for funding hunger relief initiatives; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Fund - Hunger Relief Initiatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-09 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-07-08 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Comptroller
Fees
Human Services, Department of
Interest
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Treasurers
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Fees
Human Services, Department of
Interest
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Treasurers
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 619.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |