MD HB307 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 @ 12:00 pm Senate Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission; authorizing the staff member provided by the Office of the Attorney General to issue certain subpoenas; requiring the Commission to hold certain public meetings in each county where a lynching of an African American by a white mob has been documented; authorizing the Commission to research cases of racially motivated lynching; requiring the Commission to submit an interim and final report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before certain dates; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission

Sponsors

Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Heather Bagnall [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]
Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Sandy Bartlett [D]Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Tony Bridges [D]
Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Ned Carey [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]
Del. Nick Charles [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]
Del. Wanika Fisher [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Andrea Harrison [D]
Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]
Del. Seth Howard [R]Del. Julian Ivey [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]
Del. Mary Lehman [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]
Del. Sara Love [D]Del. Michael Malone [R]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. David Moon [D]
Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]
Del. Mike Rogers [D]Del. Sid Saab [R]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Emily Shetty [D]
Del. Stephanie Smith [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. Veronica Turner [D]
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Ron Watson [D]
Del. Melissa Wells [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Dan Cox [R]Del. Jon Cardin [D]
Del. Lesley Lopez [D]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Susan McComas [R]Del. Lauren Arikan [R]

Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {802419/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback