MD HB306 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB479
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup on Independent Innovation in Prince George's County to promote innovation and technology in the county; and requiring the Workgroup by January 15, 2026, to report on recommendations regarding strategies to support investments in industry opportunities and potential areas of innovation to the Prince George's County Delegation and the General Assembly.
Title
Prince George's County - Economic Development - Workgroup on Independent Innovation in Prince George's County - Establishment PG 402-24
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2024-04-06 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {633225/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2024-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {693226/1 Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB479 (Carry Over) 2023-01-31 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Boundaries
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Construction
Contracts
County Administrators
County Councils
County Executives
Economic Development
Enterprise Zones
Federal Government
General Assembly
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Investments
Mentors
Partnerships
Prince George's County
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Students
studies
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appropriations
Boundaries
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Construction
Contracts
County Administrators
County Councils
County Executives
Economic Development
Enterprise Zones
Federal Government
General Assembly
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Investments
Mentors
Partnerships
Prince George's County
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Students
studies
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment