MD HB306 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue a waiver from certain place of worship distance restrictions for certain alcoholic beverages licenses; and requiring public hearings to be held in a certain jurisdiction, recommendations to be made regarding whether the distance restrictions should be waived, and certain information to be considered before a waiver will be issued.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Waiver From Distance Restrictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Communications
Counties
Examinations
Harford County
Hearings
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Municipal Corporations
Open Government
Places of Worship
Public Information
Reports
Restaurants
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Communications
Counties
Examinations
Harford County
Hearings
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Municipal Corporations
Open Government
Places of Worship
Public Information
Reports
Restaurants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |