MD HB305 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-9)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Mar 20 @ 1:00 pm Senate Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]


Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to identify homeowners who may be eligible but have failed to apply for the homestead property tax credit; and requiring the Department to include a separate insert with each assessment notice sent to each homeowner that may be eligible for the property tax credit that informs the homeowner about the potential for eligibility and how to apply for the credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]


2018-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {545468/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-06HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means


Maryland State Sources

Bill Comments