MD HB305 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a merchant from using specified technology to monitor the behavior or shopping habits of a consumer unless the merchant provides a specified notice in a specified manner; providing that a violation of the Act is an unfair or deceptive trade practice under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act and is subject to specified enforcement and penalty provisions; and providing for the application of the Act.
Title
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required Notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-45) (Y: 94 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-45) |
2016-02-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Electronic Surveillance
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Unfair Trade Practices
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Electronic Surveillance
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Unfair Trade Practices