MD HB304 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Division of Consumer Protection in the Office of the Attorney General to bring a certain action under the Consumer Protection Act against a person who violates a certain provision of criminal law regarding the exploitation of a vulnerable adult; adding a violation of a certain provision of criminal law regarding the exploitation of a vulnerable adult to the unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practices that are subject to enforcement and penalties under the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
2020-01-22HouseHearing canceled (Judiciary)
2020-01-21HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2020-01-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters and Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations and Associations11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Corporations and Associations11209(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law13201(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law13204(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law13301(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law8801(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback