MD HB303 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Maryland Pharmacy Act does not prohibit, under specified circumstances, a licensed dentist from dispensing a full course of treatment of antibiotics to a patient for infection control.
Title
Health Occupations - Licensed Dentists Who Dispense Antibiotics - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {836489/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |