MD HB302 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $250,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Art League of Ocean City Inc. for the renovation and reconstruction of the Ocean City Center for the Arts; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Ocean City Center for the Arts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/10 at 3:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-30 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Community Facilities and Services
Ocean City
State Bonds
Worcester County
Community Facilities and Services
Ocean City
State Bonds
Worcester County
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0302.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0302f.pdf |