MD HB301 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Maryland Pharmacy Act does not apply, under specified circumstances, to a licensed dentist who obtains a specified permit from the State Board of Dental Examiners and who dispenses specified products or rinses; providing that specified provisions of law do not apply to a licensed dentist who obtains a specified permit under a specified provision of the Act; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Dentists With Permits to Dispense Dental Products - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {236884/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |