MD HB300 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a jackpot won at a video lottery terminal that is not claimed by the winner within 182 days after the jackpot is won shall become the property of the State and be distributed in a specified manner.
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Sponsors
Del. Diana Fennell [D] | Del. Darryl Barnes [D] | Del. Eric Luedtke [D] | Del. James Tarlau [D] |
Del. Carolyn Howard [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-11) (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-11) (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-11) |
2017-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {385263/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Claims
Comptroller
Electronic Funds Transfer
Gaming
Lottery
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Video
Claims
Comptroller
Electronic Funds Transfer
Gaming
Lottery
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Video