MD HB30 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that certain provisions of law relating to closed-door meetings of a board of directors of a condominium do not allow the board to withhold or agree to withhold from the unit owners the terms of any legal agreement to which the council of unit owners is a party; establishing that a provision in a certain agreement that prohibits a the disclosure to certain unit owners or purchasers of any term of the agreement is unenforceable; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominiums – Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-03-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {340610/1 Adopted
2020-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-08HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-09-03HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB471 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property11109.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11134.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback