MD HB3 | 2021 | First Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the boundaries of the residence districts for the Montgomery County Board of Education.
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education Residence Districts - Redistricting Plan MC 01-21SS
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 122 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 122 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Hearing 12/08 at 9:30 a.m. |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Referred Reapportionment and Redistricting |
2021-12-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2021-12-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-12-06 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-12-06 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (122-14) |
2021-12-06 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-12-02 | House | Hearing 12/06 at 12:30 p.m. |
2021-12-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB3 (Crossfiled) 2021-12-06 - First Reading Reapportionment and Redistricting
Subjects
Boundaries
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Emergency Bills
Montgomery County
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Emergency Bills
Montgomery County
Reapportionment and Redistricting