MD HB3 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that licenses to manufacture, sell, buy, and store cigarettes do not authorize the licensee to manufacture, ship, import, or sell into or within the State a cigarette that has a characterizing flavor; providing that a public statement that cigarettes or other tobacco products have or produce a certain smell or taste is presumptive evidence that they have a characterizing flavor if the statement is made by certain persons: prohibiting the sale of electronic smoking devices by mail or certain other networks; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Regulation – Tobacco Products – Electronic Smoking Devices, Prohibition on Flavoring, and Sales to Military Members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-14SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (95-38)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFloor Committee Amendment {993496/1 Adopted
2020-03-11HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {983594/1 Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-01-16HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
2020-01-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
2019-09-04HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB233 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-17 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation16101(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation16206(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation16209(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation16214(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation16223(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation163A-02(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation163A-03(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation16501(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation5101(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation5205(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation5212(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation5214.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation5217(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation7101(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation7204(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation7204.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation7211(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation7215(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law10107(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General24305(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General24307(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11203(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback