MD HB3 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the value of any medals awarded by specified committees and the amount of any prize money or honoraria that is received from the United States Olympic Committee that is the result of a performance at specified international sporting events; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic, Paralympic, Special Olympic, and Deaflympic Games Medals and Prizes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {585860/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {585860/1 |
2017-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-01-18 | House | Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m. |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-08-19 | House | Pre-filed |