MD HB3 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting from specified regulation the distribution of raw milk and raw milk products from milk producers directly to the final consumer if the consumer has acquired a specified ownership interest in specified animals; requiring the consumer and the milk producer to enter into a written contract of agistment relating to a specified ownership interest; establishing that the exemption does not apply to specified sales of milk and milk products; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health - Milk Products - Raw Milk - Consumer-Owned Livestock

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-24HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2014-01-28HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2013-08-07HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback