MD HB3 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an employer to provide protective body armor to an employee who is required to carry a firearm loaded with live rounds; and defining terms.
Title
Business Regulation - Employees Who Carry Firearms - Protective Body Armor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2009-07-13 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0003.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0003f.pdf |