MD HB299 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a refillable container permit for draft beer in Worcester County; authorizing the Worcester County Board of License Commissioners to issue a refillable container permit for draft beer to holders of a Class B or a Class D license; requiring licensees to complete the form provided by the Board and pay an annual permit fee of $500; providing that the hours of sale for the permit begin at the same time as those for the underlying license and end at midnight; etc.
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft Beer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {623090/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Blue Laws
Fees
Forms
Hearings
Hotels and Motels
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Notices
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Worcester County
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Blue Laws
Fees
Forms
Hearings
Hotels and Motels
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Notices
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Worcester County