MD HB298 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering in Montgomery County the hours of consumption for certain alcoholic beverages licenses; requiring license holders to remove alcoholic beverages containers from the tables and bar service area at the end of the hours of sale permitted under the license; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Consumption MC 09-20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 157
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-04SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-02-28HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-24HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-03HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-21HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages25102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages252001(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages252002(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages252004(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages252005(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages252006(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages252007(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback