MD HB296 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a petitioner receiving medical treatment at a hospital to electronically file a petition for a temporary protective order while at the hospital; requiring hospitals to refer petitioners to certain programs; authorizing a petitioner to electronically file a petition for a temporary protective order from certain programs and centers; and requiring a court that receives an electronically filed petition to hold a hearing through video conferencing either the same or next business day under certain circumstances.
Title
Temporary Protective Orders - Electronic Filing and Video Conferencing Hearings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-0) |
2022-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {873320/1 Adopted |
2022-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB280 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Courts
District Courts
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Family Law
Hearings
Patients
Petitions
Protection Orders
Courts
District Courts
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Family Law
Hearings
Patients
Petitions
Protection Orders
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 4 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 4 | 504.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |