MD HB296 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Designating specified areas of the State as State wildlands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-35) (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-35) (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Beitzel) {163527/1 Rejected (41-91) (Y: 41 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465
2014-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2014-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (101-35)
2014-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2014-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2014-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {344936/1 Report Adopted
2014-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-02-26SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-02-25HouseThird Reading Passed (100-35)
2014-02-25HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
2014-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-02-20HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Beitzel) {163527/1 Rejected (41-91)
2014-02-20HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {153828/1 Adopted
2014-02-18HouseSpecial Order until 2/20 (Delegate McDermott) Adopted
2014-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {250412/1 Report Adopted
2014-02-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2014-02-05HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2014-01-20HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0296?ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0296f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0296t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0296e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_465_hb0296e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0296_25041201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0296_15382801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0296_16352701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0296_34493601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0296.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0296_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0296_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0296,h-0114&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0296,h-0154&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0296,s-0992&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0296,h-1249&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback