MD HB295 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to review and update certain regulations at least once every 5 years; requiring certain regulations to incorporate the most recent precipitation data available; requiring the Department to review and update certain regulations in a certain manner; requiring the Department to take certain actions at least 6 months before the proposal of regulations under the Act; altering the time by which the Department must hold a certain public hearing; etc.
Title
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640 |
2021-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-34) |
2021-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {790117/1 Adopted |
2021-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB227 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Data
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
Flood Control
internet
Maryland Emergency Management Agency
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Time
Water
Water Pollution
Weapons
Weights and Measures
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Data
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
Flood Control
internet
Maryland Emergency Management Agency
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Time
Water
Water Pollution
Weapons
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 4 | 201.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 4 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 4 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |