MD HB295 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a nonpublic elementary or secondary school that receives State funds from refusing enrollment of, expelling, withholding privileges from, or discriminating against any student or prospective student because of an individual's race, color, religion, sex, age, national origin, marital status, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability; prohibiting such a school that receives State funds from taking retaliatory action against a student or parent or guardian who files a complaint alleging discrimination; etc.
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsors
Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D] | Del. Darryl Barnes [D] | Del. Jessica Feldmark [D] | Del. Diana Fennell [D] |
Del. Wanika Fisher [D] | Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-47) (Y: 94 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-47) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {955860/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Commission on Civil Rights
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Discrimination
Education
Gender
Human Relations
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Employees
Religion
Revenue and Taxes
Sexual Orientation
State Aid
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Students
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Commission on Civil Rights
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Discrimination
Education
Gender
Human Relations
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Employees
Religion
Revenue and Taxes
Sexual Orientation
State Aid
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Students
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment