MD HB295 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-07 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-07 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law relating to dividends payable in shares of one class of a corporation's stock to holders of shares of another class of the corporation's stock; clarifying that all business and affairs of a corporation, whether or not in the ordinary course, must be managed under the direction of the corporation's board of directors; requiring each nominee for director of a corporation to have the qualifications required by the charter or bylaws of the corporation; etc.
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-04 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-01 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-02 | First Reading Economic Matters |