MD HB293 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision providing that an order or a decision in a domestic violence proceeding is inadmissible as evidence in a divorce proceeding; and repealing a provision prohibiting a court from considering compliance with a domestic violence order as grounds for granting a decree of limited or absolute divorce.
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order
Sponsors
Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Del. Marice Morales [D] |
Del. Carlos Sanchez [D] | Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Judiciary |