MD HB293 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified percentage that may be retained by a public body under a specified contract under specified circumstances; repealing an authorization for a public body to retain a specified percentage of a specified contract under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Retention of Percentage of Contract - Security
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2013-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {134636/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-11 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {116383/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Escrow Accounts
Municipal Corporations
Procurement
State Government - Procurement
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Escrow Accounts
Municipal Corporations
Procurement
State Government - Procurement