MD HB293 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting persons from practicing physical therapy in the State unless there is an automated external defibrillator in the treatment area of physical therapy offices and staff members who have received specified training are on-site; providing an exception to the requirements of the Act; etc.
Title
Physical Therapy Offices - Automated External Defibrillators - Training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0293.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0293f.pdf |