MD HB292 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of Contract Appeals to award an interested party reasonable costs of filing and pursuing a protest, including attorney's fees, if an appeal is sustained and there is a violation of law or regulation; and authorizing the Board of Contract Appeals to award a contractor under any State contract the reasonable costs of filing and pursuing a claim, including attorney's fees, if the unit processing the claim acts in bad faith, without justification, or in violation of law.
Title
State Procurement - Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Attorney's Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {663028/1 Adopted |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB667 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-01 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Appeals
Attorneys' Fees
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Procurement
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Attorneys' Fees
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Procurement
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 221.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 221.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |