MD HB292 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in specified jurisdictions a nonrefillable container permit; authorizing a permit holder to sell draft beer for off-premises consumption by packaging the beer in a nonrefillable container that meets specified standards; specifying requirements for permit holders, hours of sale, and permit fees; and prohibiting permit fees to be charged for a nonrefillable container permit if the applicant has a refillable container permit.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {123399/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Fees
Licenses
Retail Sales
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Fees
Licenses
Retail Sales
Time