MD HB292 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the period of time that specified individuals at least 25 years old who hold a learner's instructional permit are required to wait before taking an examination for a provisional driver's license; altering specified driving practice requirements before taking examinations for a provisional driver's license that apply to an individual at least 25 years old; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Provisional Driver's Licenses - Driver Education Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-04-03 | Conference Committee Report 853723/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Senators Raskin, Brochin, and Shank | |
2012-03-30 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-30 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments 998070/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-20 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-04-03 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (125-0) | |
2012-04-03 | Conference Committee Report 853723/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Delegates Malone, Glenn, and Norman | |
2012-03-30 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-30 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2012-03-30 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments 570015/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-01-30 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-27 | First Reading Environmental Matters |