MD HB291 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Division of Correction to conduct a certain educational, vocational, and job history interview for each inmate as soon as feasible after the individual is sentenced to the jurisdiction of the Division; and requiring the Division to include the results of a certain educational, vocational, and job history interview in certain inmate case records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Inmate Case Record - Educational, Vocational, and Job History

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-5) (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-20) (Y: 114 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 144
2018-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (41-5)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-08SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2018-02-23SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (113-20)
2018-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-20HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-19HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2018-01-30HouseHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback