MD HB290 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB13
Note: Carry Over of previous HB452
Note: Carry Over of previous HB452
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person who is the victim of an act that would constitute a violation of certain hate crime laws may bring a civil action against the person or persons who committed the act in a court of competent jurisdiction; authorizing the court to impose an injunction and award certain economic and noneconomic damages; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Hate Crimes – Civil Remedy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-41) |
2022-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB290 (Carry Over) 2022-04-08 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
SB71 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Carter) Adopted
HB452 (Carry Over) 2021-01-18 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
SB71 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Carter) Adopted
HB452 (Carry Over) 2021-01-18 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Damages
Discrimination
Victims
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Damages
Discrimination
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |