MD HB289 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing new boundaries for the county commissioner districts in Somerset County; providing for the reopening of the candidate filing deadline for a candidate for the office of member of the Somerset County Board of Education who will be elected at the 2022 general election; and prohibiting an individual who files for the office of member of the Somerset County Board of Education from withdrawing the candidacy.
Title
Somerset County – Elections – County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred Reapportionment and Redistricting |
2022-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2022-01-17 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB270 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Subjects
Boundaries
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Education, Boards of
Elections
Emergency Bills
Political Candidates
Public Officials
Somerset County
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Education, Boards of
Elections
Emergency Bills
Political Candidates
Public Officials
Somerset County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Somerset County | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |