MD HB289 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB846
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making certain provisions of law relating to the filing, issuance, and modification of certain peace orders and to the shielding of certain court records of certain peace order proceedings apply to certain peace orders filed by certain employers on the basis of certain acts committed against certain employees at the employees' workplace; requiring an employer to notify an employee before the employer files a certain petition; etc.
Title
Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341 |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {463729/1 Adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2021-04-12 | House | Conference Committee Report {463729/1 Adopted |
2021-04-10 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Sydnor, Hettleman and Carter) |
2021-04-10 | House | Senate Refuses Recede |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Sydnor, Hettleman and Carter) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate Refuses Recede |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Shetty and Williams) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Shetty and Williams) |
2021-04-09 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2021-04-09 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {938771/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {938771/1 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-4) |
2021-02-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-09 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB105 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-10 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Atterbeary, Shetty and Williams)
SB846 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
SB846 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Liability
Notices
Petitions
Privacy
Protection Orders
Records
Violence
Work, Labor, and Employment
Liability
Notices
Petitions
Privacy
Protection Orders
Records
Violence
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1503.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 1510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |