MD HB289 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 778
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 778
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a marketplace license in a specified alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City; authorizing the Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners to issue the license; authorizing a license holder to obtain a refillable container permit under specified conditions; requiring the marketplace to have a minimum seating capacity of 75 individuals, a minimum capacity of 200 individuals, and a maximum capacity of 500 individuals; providing an annual license fee of $6,000; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 778 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {663596/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Beverage Containers
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Beverage Containers
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Weights and Measures