MD HB286 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the stakeholders required to be included in meetings convened under the Maternal Mortality Review Program to include families of women who have experienced near maternal death, a maternal death, or certain challenges during pregnancy or women who have experienced a near maternal death or certain other challenges during pregnancy; and requiring that, to the extent practicable, certain stakeholders convened under the Program reflect the racial and ethnic diversity of women most impacted by maternal deaths in the State.
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Stakeholders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 154 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {546389/1 Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Death
Demographics
Ethics
Ethnic Affairs
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Pregnancy
Public Health
Records
Reports
Safety
Women
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Death
Demographics
Ethics
Ethnic Affairs
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Pregnancy
Public Health
Records
Reports
Safety
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 1213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |