MD HB286 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person who was convicted of a crime to file a petition for expungement if the person has an identity theft passport indicating that the crime was actually committed by another using the person's personal identifying information; and authorizing a court to grant a petition for expungement at any time if the person presents an identity theft passport under specified circumstances.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Identity Theft
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2016-02-19 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-26 | House | First Reading Judiciary |