MD HB286 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to publish in a specified manner specified medical loss ratio information for managed care organizations participating in the medical assistance program on the Web site of the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene.
Title
Managed Care Organizations - Medical Loss Ratio Information - Publication
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-03-16 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-29 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-03-28 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-28 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2012-02-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-23 | Favorable with Amendments 536084/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-01-27 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Prices
Publications
Electronic Government
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Prices
Publications