MD HB286 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring hospitals and freestanding ambulatory care facilities, as a condition of licensure, to establish a practitioner performance evaluation process and to analyze the results of the process; requiring the practitioner performance evaluation process to include a review of care; requiring hospitals and freestanding ambulatory care facilities to take into account the results of the evaluation process for a member of the medical staff in the reappointment process; etc.
Title
Hospitals and Freestanding Ambulatory Care Facilities - Practitioner
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-16 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-01 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Clinics
Fines
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Licenses
Patients
Physicians
Work, Labor and Employment
Fines
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Licenses
Patients
Physicians
Work, Labor and Employment