MD HB285 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Transportation to collect and consolidate available information from State and local agencies regarding an unmet need for safe pedestrian and bicycle access to schools in the State; and requiring the Department to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2020.
Title
Department of Transportation – Pedestrian and Bicycle Access to Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295 |
2018-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {420419/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Bicycles
Pedestrians
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Pedestrians
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road